Al Jurfi, Ismail Jaber Ahmed (CPSO#: 87672)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 07 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2011