Al Kaabi, Nawal Ahmed Mohamed Saeed (CPSO#: 72879)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005