Al Ka'abi, Said Salim Abdullah (CPSO#: 110403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 02 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 603-5275
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

youthdale treatment centres
227 Victoria St
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Canada
Phone: 416-703-0505
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAID SALIM ABDULLAH AL KA'ABI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL KA'ABI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL KA'ABI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL KA'ABI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL KA'ABI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. AL KA'ABI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. AL KA'ABI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018