Al Kaabi, Saif Mohamed Saif Bakhit (CPSO#: 78300)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 04 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2003 to 04 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2004 to 04 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007