Al Kaabi, Salem Khamis Salem Tuaib (CPSO#: 74266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALEM KHAMIS SALEM TUAIB AL KAABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL KAABI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2006