Al Karmi, Rani Nasib Ibrahim (CPSO#: 81761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Russian

Education:Irkutsk State Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
438 Richmond Rd
Ottawa ON  K2A 0G2
Phone: (613) 722-4747
Fax: (866) 557-7057
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANI NASIB IBRAHIM AL KARMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL KARMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2004 to 03 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 01 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
International Specialist Physician - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009