Al Khabori, Murtadha Khamis Ghouloum (CPSO#: 78924)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Apr 2003 to 27 May 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2010