Al Khalifa, Abdulwahab Mohamed Abdulwahab (CPSO#: 88244)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015