Al Khalifah, Reem Abdullah H (CPSO#: 102802)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 May 2014 to 30 May 2014
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 29 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2015