Al Khater, Reem Abdullah Ali (CPSO#: 83602)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 23 Oct 2005
PEAP - Resident - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2005 to 14 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2006 to 14 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2007 to 14 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2009 to 14 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012