Al Khayyat, Shadi Salem Mohammad (CPSO#: 81221)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jun 2004 to 03 Aug 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013