Al Khdair, Darar Abdulghani (CPSO#: 84087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Kuwait University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
chest diseases hospital
Kuwait 965
Kuwait
Phone: +965-98950708

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Kuwait

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARAR ABDULGHANI AL KHDAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL KHDAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 2006 to 04 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2011