Al Lawati, Ali Iqbal Ali (CPSO#: 90261)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2009 to 01 May 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 May 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2016