Al Lawati, Hatim Ali Abdul Hussain (CPSO#: 82304)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2005 to 31 May 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013