Al Lehebi, Ahmed Omar N (CPSO#: 107883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905)525-9140 Ext. 2660
Fax: (905)527-2707
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Nova Scotia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED OMAR N AL LEHEBI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL LEHEBI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. AL LEHEBI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL LEHEBI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL LEHEBI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL LEHEBI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL LEHEBI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2015 to 18 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018