Al Malki, Najlaa Kheder Abdullah Hussein (CPSO#: 88067)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 07 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Mar 2008 to 28 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2009