Al Mohawes, Hanan Abdulrahman Mohammed (CPSO#: 77232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Crescent Town Health Centre
4 The Market Place (Crescent Town)
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Phone: 416 690 3412
Fax: 416 690 6734
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmed Al Awamer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al Mohawes ( CPSO# 77232 )
Dr. A. Al Awamer ( CPSO# 77237 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
610 University Avenue
16th Floor
Room 16-757
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Crescent Town Health Centre
4 The Market Place, Crescent Town
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Phone Number: (416) 690-3412

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANAN ABDULRAHMAN MOHAMMED AL MOHAWES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL MOHAWES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 01 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 01 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 01 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2013