Al Moshary, May Abdullah Abdulkareem (CPSO#: 85673)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2006 to 24 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007