Al Mosyab, Nemer Fahd Hamad (CPSO#: 86104)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 04 Jul 2007
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 05 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2014