Al Murshedi, Fathiya Mohammed Abdullah (CPSO#: 80044)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009