Al Mutairi, Abdullah J M M Sh (CPSO#: 102586)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2014 to 02 Apr 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2016