Al Muttawa, Latifa Abdullah Mohammed (CPSO#: 107798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  19 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 19 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neonatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6925
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LATIFA ABDULLAH MOHAMMED AL MUTTAWA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL MUTTAWA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL MUTTAWA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL MUTTAWA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL MUTTAWA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. AL MUTTAWA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. AL MUTTAWA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 19 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2015 to 26 Oct 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Jan 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jan 2018