Al Nakhli, Daifallah Jaafar Hassan (CPSO#: 83754)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2005 to 09 Dec 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 10 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008