Al Nasser, Sami Mohammed A (CPSO#: 84307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
865 Regent St
Third floor, unit 304
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 523-725
Fax: (705) 523-7264
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Pertosa drive unit 205
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Canada
Phone: (905) 796-7333
Fax: 905) 796-7333
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMI MOHAMMED A AL NASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL NASSER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2012