Al Nuaimi, Mohammed Ali Said (CPSO#: 105607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 09 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5310
Fax: (416) 813-5230
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Oman

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ALI SAID AL NUAIMI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL NUAIMI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL NUAIMI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL NUAIMI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL NUAIMI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL NUAIMI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL NUAIMI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Apr 2015 to 08 Jun 2015
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 09 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018