Al Nuaimi, Salem Bakhit Suwaidan Bakhit (CPSO#: 76928)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008