Al Obeidani, Said Issa Humoud (CPSO#: 83830)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2005 to 09 Dec 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 11 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Nov 2007