Al Osaimi, Noura Matoug (CPSO#: 97497)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U of Ottawa Health Services
University of Ottawa
300-100 Marie Curie Pvt.
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N9
Phone: 6135643950
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Jan 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOURA MATOUG AL OSAIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL OSAIMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2017 to 28 Feb 2017
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2017