Al Otaibi, Faisal Aboud Jasser Al Ruwais (CPSO#: 85940)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Feb 2007 to 25 Apr 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010