Al Otay, Abdulhakim Abdulaziz A (CPSO#: 94712)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 01 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 02 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012