Al Qarshoubi, Issa Saif Mohammed (CPSO#: 80634)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 May 2004 to 27 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2015