Al Qurashi, Fat-hia Sayed Kamel Mohamed Ahmed (CPSO#: 80452)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Feb 2004 to 30 Mar 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 31 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005