Al Raisi, Marwan Saud Dawood (CPSO#: 92124)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 14 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2014