Al Rasheed, Abdullah Khalid Mohammad (CPSO#: 71899)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 21 Aug 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2000