Al Rawahi, Bader Abdullah Saif (CPSO#: 101238)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016