Al Rawahi, Hatem Mas'oud Muslem (CPSO#: 108777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: Al Rawahi, Hatem Masoud Musalam (used until: 08 May 2017 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Infectious Diseases
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HATEM MAS'OUD MUSLEM AL RAWAHI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL RAWAHI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL RAWAHI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL RAWAHI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL RAWAHI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL RAWAHI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL RAWAHI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 May 2016 to 24 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017