Al Riyami, Nihal Mohammed Aamer (CPSO#: 78636)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 21 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009