Al Saad, Saad Mohammad A (CPSO#: 108200)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Nov 2015 to 14 Jan 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Nov 2017
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2017