Al Saati, Basem (CPSO#: 83765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Sep 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B1B6
Phone: (647) 745-2252
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Basem Al Saati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Al Saati ( CPSO# 83765 )

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Basem  Zafer  Al Saati may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics,
            only.