Al Saedi, Dakhil Aied (CPSO#: 77235)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 10 Jan 2002 to 09 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 10 Jan 2003 to 09 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 10 Jan 2004 to 09 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 10 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 09 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 10 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006