Al Saffar, Mansour Abdulrahman Mohammed (CPSO#: 85888)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007