Al Sahlawi, Muthana Abdullah A (CPSO#: 110041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  22 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 20 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUTHANA ABDULLAH A AL SAHLAWI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL SAHLAWI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL SAHLAWI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL SAHLAWI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL SAHLAWI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL SAHLAWI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL SAHLAWI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 22 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jan 2018