Al Salman, Mortadah Hadi N (CPSO#: 108356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 02 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: 6135336000 Ext. 77046
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORTADAH HADI N AL SALMAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL SALMAN is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. AL SALMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL SALMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL SALMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL SALMAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL SALMAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2016 to 01 Feb 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 02 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2017