Al Samri, Mohammed Taleb Mohammed (CPSO#: 77213)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005