Al Senaidi, Khalfan Salim Khalfan (CPSO#: 79213)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2003 to 29 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 30 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006