Al Shaikh, Omalkhaire Mustafa (CPSO#: 105023)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 23 Dec 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 24 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2017