Al Shammary, Mofeedah Obaid N (CPSO#: 102112)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2016