Al Shammasi, Zahra Abdrabalamir A (CPSO#: 104778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 18 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Symth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73668
Fax: (613) 738-8522
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAHRA ABDRABALAMIR A AL SHAMMASI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL SHAMMASI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. AL SHAMMASI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL SHAMMASI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL SHAMMASI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL SHAMMASI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL SHAMMASI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018