Al Shamousi, Khalid Rabia Hassan (CPSO#: 108648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID RABIA HASSAN AL SHAMOUSI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL SHAMOUSI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. AL SHAMOUSI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL SHAMOUSI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL SHAMOUSI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL SHAMOUSI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL SHAMOUSI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 06 Apr 2016 to 04 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2016 to 17 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017