Al Shidi, Ali Mohammed Saif (CPSO#: 102560)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Oman

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jan 2014 to 10 Feb 2014
PEAP - Resident - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2014 to 28 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Nov 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 10 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Feb 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2017